House
|
04/18/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1438 (Ch. 2023-94)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted SB 1438
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/18/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Original reference removed: Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable with CS by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|