Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1423 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023