House
|
04/25/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 256 (Ch. 2023-35)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/SB 256
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Favorable by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|