Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1445 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023