House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Filed |