House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1352 (Ch. 2023-258)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Removed from Meeting Agenda of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|