Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1481 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 20, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 16, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023