Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 10, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023