House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 262 (Ch. 2023-201), CS/CS/SB 1648 (Ch. 2023-262)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Original reference removed: Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|