Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1549 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 23, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 25, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023