Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1577 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 29, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023