House | 05/05/2023 | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Favorable by Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Now in Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Filed |