Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1615 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023