House | 05/01/2023 | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1718 (Ch. 2023-40) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Original reference removed: Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Original reference removed: Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Reported out of Commerce Committee | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee | ||
House | 04/23/2023 | PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Filed |