Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1617 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2023