07/07/2023 | Chapter No. 2023-348 | |||
06/28/2023 | Approved by Governor | |||
06/14/2023 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
House | 05/04/2023 | Ordered enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Received | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | CS passed; YEAS 81, NAYS 33 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Amendment 933689 Failed | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Amendment 411523 Failed | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Amendment 208369 Failed | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Amendment 842919 Failed | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Amendment 489881 Failed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023) | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Filed |