Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1645 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 11, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023