Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H5201 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 20, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023