House
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 62 (Ch. 2023-320)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted SB 62
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|