HB 6005 2023 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb6005-00 Page 1 of 6 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S A bill to be entitled 1 An act for the relief of Robert Earl DuBoise; 2 providing an appropriation to compensate Mr. DuBoise 3 for being wrongfully incarcerated for almost 37 years; 4 directing the Chief Financial Officer to draw a 5 warrant payable directly to Mr. DuBoise; providing for 6 the waiver of certain tuition and fees for Mr. 7 DuBoise; requiring the Chief Financial Officer to pay 8 the directed funds without requiring that Mr. DuBois e 9 sign a liability release; declaring that the 10 Legislature does not waive certain defenses or 11 increase the state's limits of liability with respect 12 to the act; prohibiting funds awarded under the act to 13 Mr. DuBoise from being used or paid for specified 14 attorney or lobbying fees; prohibiting Mr. DuBoise 15 from submitting a compensation application under 16 certain provisions upon his receipt of payment under 17 this act; requiring specific reimbursement to the 18 state should a civil award be issued subsequent to Mr. 19 DuBoise's receipt of payment under the act; requiring 20 Mr. DuBoise to notify the Department of Legal Affairs 21 upon filing certain civil actions; requiring the 22 department to file a specified notice under certain 23 circumstances; providing that certain benefits a re 24 vacated upon specified findings; providing an 25 HB 6005 2023 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb6005-00 Page 2 of 6 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S effective date. 26 27 WHEREAS, Robert Earl DuBoise was arrested on October 22, 28 1983, for the August 18, 1983, rape and murder of a Tampa Bay 29 woman and was convicted of capital murder and attempted sexual 30 battery on March 7, 1985, and 31 WHEREAS, Mr. DuBoise spent 3 years on death row, and 32 WHEREAS, on March 10, 1988, the Florida Supreme Court 33 issued a mandate vacating Mr. DuBoise's death sentence, and on 34 April 4, 1988, he was resentenced to life imprisonment fo r 35 murder and a consecutive 15 -year sentence for attempted sexual 36 battery, and 37 WHEREAS, Mr. DuBoise has maintained his innocence since his 38 arrest and for the entirety of his incarceration for the past 37 39 years, and 40 WHEREAS, on September 11, 2020, the Conv iction Review Unit 41 (CRU) for the State Attorney's Office for the 13th Judicial 42 Circuit issued a 49-page "CRU Summary Fact -Finding Report" based 43 on a comprehensive investigation spanning nearly 1 year, 44 culminating in the conclusion that "Robert DuBoise's co nviction 45 should be vacated and Robert DuBoise be exonerated of the 46 charges against him," and 47 WHEREAS, on September 14, 2020, the Circuit Court for the 48 13th Judicial Circuit granted, with the concurrence of the 49 state, a motion for postconviction relief, va cated the judgment 50 HB 6005 2023 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb6005-00 Page 3 of 6 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S and sentence of Mr. DuBoise, and ordered a new trial, and 51 WHEREAS, the CRU report found that there was no credible 52 evidence of Mr. DuBoise's guilt and, likewise, that there was 53 clear and convincing evidence of his innocence, and 54 WHEREAS, on September 14, 2020, as the result of the CRU 55 report, the state orally pronounced a nolle prosequi with regard 56 to the retrial of Mr. DuBoise, and 57 WHEREAS, the Legislature acknowledges that the state's 58 system of justice yielded an imperfect result tha t had tragic 59 consequences in this case, and 60 WHEREAS, the Legislature acknowledges that, as a result of 61 his physical confinement, Mr. DuBoise suffered significant 62 damages that are unique to him, and that the damages are due to 63 the fact that he was physical ly restrained and prevented from 64 exercising the freedom to which all innocent citizens are 65 entitled, and 66 WHEREAS, before his conviction for the aforementioned 67 crimes, Mr. DuBoise had prior convictions for unrelated 68 nonviolent felonies, and 69 WHEREAS, because of his prior nonviolent felony 70 convictions, Mr. DuBoise is ineligible for compensation under 71 chapter 961, Florida Statutes, and 72 WHEREAS, the Legislature apologizes to Mr. DuBoise on 73 behalf of the state, NOW, THEREFORE, 74 75 HB 6005 2023 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb6005-00 Page 4 of 6 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S Be It Enacted by the Legislatu re of the State of Florida: 76 77 Section 1. The facts stated in the preamble to this act 78 are found and declared to be true. 79 Section 2. The sum of $1.85 million is appropriated from 80 the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Financial Services 81 for the relief of Robert Earl DuBoise for his wrongful 82 incarceration. The Chief Financial Officer is directed to draw a 83 warrant in the sum of $1.85 million payable directly to Robert 84 Earl DuBoise. 85 Section 3. Tuition and fees for Mr. DuBoise shall be 86 waived for up to a total of 120 hours of instruction at any 87 career center established pursuant to s. 1001.44, Florida 88 Statutes, Florida College System institution established under 89 part III of chapter 1004, Florida Statutes, or state university. 90 For any educational benefit he receives, Mr. DuBoise must meet 91 and maintain the regular admission and registration requirements 92 of the career center, institution, or state university and make 93 satisfactory academic progress as defined by the educational 94 institution in which he is enrolled. 95 Section 4. The Chief Financial Officer shall pay the funds 96 directed by this act without requiring that the wrongfully 97 incarcerated person, Mr. DuBoise, sign a liability release. 98 Section 5. With respect to the relief for Mr. Du Boise as 99 described in this act, the Legislature does not waive any 100 HB 6005 2023 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb6005-00 Page 5 of 6 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S defense of sovereign immunity or increase the limits of 101 liability on behalf of the state or any person or entity that is 102 subject to s. 768.28, Florida Statutes, or any other law. Funds 103 awarded under this act to Mr. DuBoise may not be used or be paid 104 for attorney fees or lobbying fees related to this claim. 105 Section 6. Upon his receipt of payment under this act, Mr. 106 DuBoise may not submit an application for compensation under 107 chapter 961, Florida Statutes. 108 Section 7. Claimant Mr. DuBoise must notify the Department 109 of Legal Affairs upon filing any civil action related to his 110 wrongful incarceration. If, after the time that monetary 111 compensation is paid under this act, a court enters a mon etary 112 judgment in favor of Mr. DuBoise in a civil action related to 113 his wrongful incarceration, or Mr. DuBoise enters into a 114 settlement agreement with the state or any political subdivision 115 thereof related to his wrongful incarceration, Mr. DuBoise must 116 reimburse the state for the monetary compensation awarded under 117 this act, less any sums paid for attorney fees or costs incurred 118 in litigating the civil action or obtaining the settlement 119 agreement. A reimbursement required under this section may not 120 exceed the amount of monetary award Mr. DuBoise received for 121 damages in the civil action or settlement agreement. The court 122 must include in the order of judgment an award to the state of 123 any amount required to be deducted under this section. 124 Section 8. The department must file a notice of payment of 125 HB 6005 2023 CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. hb6005-00 Page 6 of 6 F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P R E S E N T A T I V E S monetary compensation in the civil action, and the notice shall 126 constitute a lien upon any judgment or settlement recovered 127 under the civil action which is equal to the sum of monetary 128 compensation paid to the cla imant under this act, less any 129 attorney fees and litigation costs. 130 Section 9. If any future judicial determination finds that 131 Mr. DuBoise, by DNA evidence or otherwise, participated in any 132 manner in the death or sexual battery for which he was 133 incarcerated, the unused benefits to which he is entitled under 134 this act are vacated. 135 Section 10. This act shall take effect upon becoming a 136 law. 137