House | 04/28/2023 | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 10 (Ch. 2023-324) | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Substituted SB 10 | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Reported out of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable by Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Filed |