Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H6019 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023