|
06/29/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-308
|
|
|
|
06/28/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 7002
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|