House | 04/25/2023 | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 250 (Ch. 2023-304) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Substituted CS/CS/SB 250 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023) | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Reported out of Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Filed |