LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
H7057
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H7057
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H7057
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
April 11, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
June 29, 2023
Analysis
May 11, 2023
Analysis
April 17, 2023
Analysis
April 14, 2023
Comm Sub
Bill
April 17, 2023
Compare