|
07/10/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-318
|
|
|
|
06/09/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 103, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted for CS/HB 6007
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (600820)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/12/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2022
|
Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|