LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0002
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0002
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0002
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
August 1, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 26, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 1, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
April 19, 2023
Analysis
April 11, 2023
Analysis
April 3, 2023
Analysis
March 30, 2023