|
07/10/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-324
|
|
|
|
06/09/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 105, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted for CS/HB 6021
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2022
|
Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|