Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0012 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023