|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-131
|
|
|
|
05/25/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted for CS/HB 75
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/18/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/30/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/15/23, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/17/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/29/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|