Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0050 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 29, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis January 17, 2023
Analysis January 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 17, 2023