|
07/10/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-320
|
|
|
|
06/09/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 105, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted for HB 6005
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/21/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/14/23, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Recommendation: Favorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/09/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|