LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0062
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0062
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0062
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 9, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 1, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
April 12, 2023
Analysis
March 20, 2023
Analysis
March 13, 2023
Analysis
March 9, 2023