Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 31 (Passed)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted HJR 31
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 7 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Education Pre-K -12
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/14/23, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
Referred to Ethics and Elections; Education Pre-K -12; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|