Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0094 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2022

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023