Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/21/2022 | Filed |