Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0100 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023