|
04/11/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-20
|
|
|
|
04/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/11/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/3/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/23, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/07/23, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Transportation; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|