Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0106 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis February 24, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 7, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2023