House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/15/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/07/23, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/14/23, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/27/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|