LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0108
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0108
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0108
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 27, 2022
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
March 15, 2023
Analysis
March 14, 2023
Analysis
March 8, 2023
Analysis
March 6, 2023
Analysis
February 15, 2023
Analysis
February 13, 2023
Comm Sub
Bill
February 15, 2023
Compare