Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/14/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/07/23, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/03/2023 | Filed |