Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0114 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023