|
05/25/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-112
|
|
|
|
05/24/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 97
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/18/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/22/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/15/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/07/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|