Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0130 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 16, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023