Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 385 (Vetoed by Governor)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/12/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|