Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0140 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023