Senate | 03/29/2023 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 543 (Ch. 2023-18) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Substituted CS/HB 543 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/29/23 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 13 NAYS 6 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/09/23, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/20/23, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed |