Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0150 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 20, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 10, 2023