|
06/13/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-204
|
|
|
|
06/09/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 23
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
CS/CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS/CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Regulated Industries
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/20/23, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Regulated Industries; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|